AZ SB1195 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Application; emergency admission; nonevaluating hospitals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application; emergency admission; nonevaluating hospitals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-12HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-16SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70278
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1195p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1195s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1195barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1195hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1195floorbarto2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70278&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70278&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70278&billStatusActionId=182358&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70278&billStatusActionId=182361&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback