AZ SB1188 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption; marital preference
Title
Adoption; marital preference
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. Steve Urie [R] |
Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate final reading , voting: (19-10-1-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | House third reading , voting: (37-20-3-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |