AZ SB1186 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
2011 tax corrections act
Title
2011 tax corrections act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (20-7-3-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-24 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-14 | House Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 3:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:15 PM | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |