AZ SB1181 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Doulas; voluntary certification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Doulas; voluntary certification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateChapter 282
2021-04-26SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0)
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-31HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-30HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-18HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2021-01-20SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74799
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1181p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1181s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0282.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481518
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488083
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488333
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488971
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489109
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74799&billStatusActionId=200191&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74799&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74799&billStatusActionId=203762&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback