AZ SB1177 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Senate Consent Calendar February 28, 2011 @ 1:45 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Senate Consent Calendar February 28, 2011 @ 1:45 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public intoxication; local laws
Title
Public intoxication; local laws
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Senate Consent Calendar February 28, 2011 @ 1:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Hold | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |