AZ SB1176 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrition assistance; benefit match
Title
Nutrition assistance; benefit match
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-05-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-13-1-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-29 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriation
Benefit Match
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Incentives
Nonlapse
Nutrition Assistance
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Welfare - Title 46
Benefit Match
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Incentives
Nonlapse
Nutrition Assistance
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Welfare - Title 46