AZ SB1172 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State capitol museum; transfer
Title
State capitol museum; transfer
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Chapter 211 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Legislative Council
Emergency
Exemption
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Management
Museum Gift Shop
Museum Gift Shop Revolving Fund
Repeal
State Capitol Museum
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Transfer
Transferring And Renumbering
Transfers (h)
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Legislative Council
Emergency
Exemption
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Management
Museum Gift Shop
Museum Gift Shop Revolving Fund
Repeal
State Capitol Museum
State Government - Title 41
Succession
Transfer
Transferring And Renumbering
Transfers (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1306 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |