AZ SB1169 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; child care; licensing
Title
Technical correction; child care; licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate final reading , voting: (19-10-1-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | House third reading , voting: (38-19-3-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House ERA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate HMLR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |