AZ SB1168 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited
Title
Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-0-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |