AZ SB1166 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal tax exemption; commercial lease.
Title
Municipal tax exemption; commercial lease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | House third reading , voting: (39-20-1-0) | |
2011-04-04 | House Consent Calendar April 04, 2011 @ 2:10 PM | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-01 | House read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:15 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |