AZ SB1158 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sentencing; court debts; fine mitigation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing; court debts; fine mitigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12114.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12116.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12116.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12137New CodeSee Bill Text
133423New CodeSee Bill Text
13603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13825New CodeSee Bill Text
13826New CodeSee Bill Text
13918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22126New CodeSee Bill Text
22410New CodeSee Bill Text
281389Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412419Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback