AZ SB1158 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 108 E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Fireworks; permissible use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks; permissible use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22 Chapter 108 E
2014-04-22 Governor Signed
2014-04-17 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-16SenateSenate final reading , voting: (25-4-1-0)
2014-04-16SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2014-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-15HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-04-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-17-0-0)
2014-04-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2014-03-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-03-19HouseHouse PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2014-03-11HouseReferred to House PSMRA Committee
2014-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House PSMRA Committee
2014-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2014-03-03SenateTransmit to House
2014-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-5-3-0)
2014-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-19SenateSenate PS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate PS Committee
2014-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-10SenateAssigned to Senate PS Committee
2014-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=SB1158
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.1158203.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.1158104.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.1158ps.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.1158rul.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.1158jp.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.1158-psmra.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.1158jp2.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.sps.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.hpsmra.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1158.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments 750

feedback