AZ SB1152 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tax authorization; consolidated election dates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax authorization; consolidated election dates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 332
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0)
2017-05-08SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate final reading FAILED, voting: (14-16-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate concurs
2017-05-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-05-04SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-05-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0)
2017-05-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-2-0-3-0-0)
2017-05-04HouseHouse WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0)
2017-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426014New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68905
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1152p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1152s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1152h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0332.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1152ways and means.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1152ugenti-rita2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68905&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68905&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=175910&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=176103&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68905&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68905&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177400&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177401&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177450&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177452&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177453&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177470&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68905&billStatusActionId=177571&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback