AZ SB1151 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; out-of-state convictions
Title
Sentencing; out-of-state convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0) | |
2012-03-22 | House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM | |
2012-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House read second time | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |