AZ SB1146 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; TPT exemption
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; TPT exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (11-18-1-0) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-3-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |