AZ SB1139 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Classroom site fund; distribution
Title
Classroom site fund; distribution
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 67 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-23-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Base Pay
Classroom Site Fund
Definition
Distributions
Education - Title 15
Performance Pay
Student Support Services
Taxation - Title 42
Classroom Site Fund
Definition
Distributions
Education - Title 15
Performance Pay
Student Support Services
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |