AZ SB1138 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Irreversible gender reassignment surgery; minors
Title
Irreversible gender reassignment surgery; minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 104 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona's Children Deserve Help Not Harm Act
Biological Sex
Effective Date
Gender Reassignment Surgery
Gender Transition
Gender Transition Procedures
Health Benefits Plan
Health Care (h)
Health Professionals
Insurance Policy
Irreversible
Legislative Findings
Legislative Right Of Intervention
Minors
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Prohibitions
Public Monies
Purpose
Unprofessional Conduct
Biological Sex
Effective Date
Gender Reassignment Surgery
Gender Transition
Gender Transition Procedures
Health Benefits Plan
Health Care (h)
Health Professionals
Insurance Policy
Irreversible
Legislative Findings
Legislative Right Of Intervention
Minors
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Prohibitions
Public Monies
Purpose
Unprofessional Conduct