AZ SB1133 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; municipalities; customer refund claims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; municipalities; customer refund claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-04-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2015-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2015-03-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-03-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-16HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0)
2015-03-11HouseReferred to House WM Committee
2015-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2015-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-03-03SenateTransmit to House
2015-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0)
2015-02-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-01-22SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-18SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-0-0)
2015-01-26SenateReferred to Senate FIN Committee
2015-01-26SenateSenate read second time
2015-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback