AZ SB1128 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Library; archives; public records; museum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Library; archives; public records; museum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-01-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-01-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-19SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0)
2021-01-13SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11479Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28440Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39121.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411306New CodeSee Bill Text
411307New CodeSee Bill Text
413020.04Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
413029.01New CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74525
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1128p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1128s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1128floorgowan.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480517
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483064
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74525&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74525&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74525&billStatusActionId=198817&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74525&billStatusActionId=200158&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74525&billStatusActionId=200682&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback