AZ SB1128 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House third reading , voting: (28-30-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House third reading , voting: (28-30-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State support for youth programs
Title
State support for youth programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | House third reading , voting: (28-30-2-0) | |
2010-04-22 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-03 | House read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-15 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-15 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 1:48 PM | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |