AZ SB1124 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Surplus lines; ADOT contracts
Title
Surplus lines; ADOT contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate final reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-02 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-02 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Consent Calendar January 30, 2012 @ 1:56 PM | |
2012-01-31 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-31 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-30 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |