AZ SB1119 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Naturopathic medicine; nutrients
Title
Naturopathic medicine; nutrients
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Senate final reading , voting: (26-4-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (51-8-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |