AZ SB1118 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
STO; scholarships; increase
Title
STO; scholarships; increase
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Empowerment Scholarship Accounts
Homeschool
Increase
Scholarships
School Tuition Organizations
Sto
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Homeschool
Increase
Scholarships
School Tuition Organizations
Sto
Taxation Of Income - Title 43