AZ SB1116 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registrations; payment prohibited
Title
Voter registrations; payment prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Payment Prohibited
Qualification And Registration Of Electors
Voter Registrations
Payment Prohibited
Qualification And Registration Of Electors
Voter Registrations