AZ SB1116 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; CORP; EORP amendments
Title
PSPRS; CORP; EORP amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate final reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | House ERA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-01-26 | Transmit to House | |
2012-01-26 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 2:10 PM with Objections | |
2012-01-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |