AZ SB1115 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revised uniform law; notarial act
Title
Revised uniform law; notarial act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 66 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-16-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-1-1-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Signatures
Notarial Act
Notaries Public
Property - Title 33
Repeal
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Revised Uniform Law
Rfeir
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Signatures
Notarial Act
Notaries Public
Property - Title 33
Repeal
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Revised Uniform Law
Rfeir
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 3140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1802.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 946 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 252 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 253 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 254 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 255 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 256 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 257 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 258 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 259 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 260 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 261 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 262 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 263 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 264 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 266 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 267 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 268 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 269 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 270 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 271 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 272 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 273 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 274 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 275 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 276 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 277 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 312 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 313 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 315 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 321 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 322 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 328 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 329 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 330 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 7003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 7011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |