AZ SB1113 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Zoning violations; notice; service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning violations; notice; service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 213
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (22-6-2-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-8-1-0)
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69925
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1113p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1113s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1113h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0213.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1113john.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1113local and international affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69925&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69925&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69925&billStatusActionId=180065&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69925&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69925&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69925&billStatusActionId=182955&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69925&billStatusActionId=182973&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69925&billStatusActionId=183158&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69925&billStatusActionId=183122&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback