AZ SB1112 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Noncustodial federal monies; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncustodial federal monies; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-25HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-16HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
2021-01-21SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74472
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1112p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1112s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482162
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487592
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487919
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488761
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74472&billStatusActionId=200688&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback