AZ SB1108 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by HB2075

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Electronic prescribing; exceptions; deadlines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic prescribing; exceptions; deadlines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2075 (Replaced by) 2019-02-14 - Chapter 4

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback