AZ HB2075 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1108

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electronic prescribing; exceptions; deadlines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic prescribing; exceptions; deadlines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Motion HB 2075 substituted for SB 1108. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateChapter 4
2019-02-14SenateGovernor Signed
2019-02-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-02-11HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-11SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2075 substituted for SB 1108. Motion carried.
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-01-31SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-01-31HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-01-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-31HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0)
2019-01-24HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-15HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1108 (Replaces) 2019-02-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
322504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362603Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71138
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2075p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2075h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0004.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2075barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2075health & human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71138&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71138&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71138&billStatusActionId=185182&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71138&billStatusActionId=185187&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71138&billStatusActionId=186142&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71138&billStatusActionId=186140&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback