AZ SB1108 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Cash assistance; children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cash assistance; children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 330
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-22-5-0)
2017-04-06HouseHouse motion to amend
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-09HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-25SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-19SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
46101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46292Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68850
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1108p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1108s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0330.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68850&billStatusActionId=174503&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68850&billStatusActionId=176867&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68850&billStatusActionId=176868&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68850&billStatusActionId=177551&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback