AZ SB1108 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of agriculture; fees
Title
Department of agriculture; fees
Sponsors
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Chapter 70 | |
2014-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-14 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-6-5-0) |
2014-04-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to House AW Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House AW Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-3-4-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |