AZ SB1107 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Redistricting; petition signatures; 2022 candidates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting; petition signatures; 2022 candidates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateChapter 155
2021-03-30SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-24SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate concurs
2021-03-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2021-03-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2021-03-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-02-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-01-21SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16322Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74467
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1107p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1107s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1107h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0155.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.11070411.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1107gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1107mesnard0935.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.1107kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.1107government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483096
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483707
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485242
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486589
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486864
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487369
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487407
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488295
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74467&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74467&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=200726&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=201069&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=201160&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74467&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74467&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=203233&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=203262&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=203379&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74467&billStatusActionId=203376&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback