AZ SB1104 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education programs; juvenile detention centers
Title
Education programs; juvenile detention centers
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Sen. David Bradley [D] |
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Detention Center Education Fund
Education - Title 15
Education Programs
Juvenile Detention Centers
School Finance
Education - Title 15
Education Programs
Juvenile Detention Centers
School Finance