AZ SB1103 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Title
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Ballot
Conditional Enactment
Conforming Legislation
Department Of Administration
Duties
Elected Officials
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Lieutenant Governor
Secretary Of State
State Government - Title 41
Ballot
Conditional Enactment
Conforming Legislation
Department Of Administration
Duties
Elected Officials
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Lieutenant Governor
Secretary Of State
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |