AZ SB1102 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property taxes; abatement; procedures
Title
Property taxes; abatement; procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1476.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1476.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1478 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1485.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 18151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 18154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 18351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 18352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 18353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |