AZ SB1102 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Guardians; duties; access to ward
Title
Guardians; duties; access to ward
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House CFA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House CFA Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House CFA Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |