AZ SB1102 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State compensation fund; conforming changes
Title
State compensation fund; conforming changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Senate final reading , voting: (26-4-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | House third reading , voting: (44-15-1-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Transmit to House | |
2011-01-27 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-3-2-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-01-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-12 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |