AZ SB1096 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Property management records; residential rentals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property management records; residential rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26 Transmitted to Governor
2020-05-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-05-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-17-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-10HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-1-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-30HouseTransmit to House
2020-01-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-23SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-3-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-09SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
322175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72726
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1096p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1096s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10960434.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1096com.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1096pace0744.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72726&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72726&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72726&billStatusActionId=191994&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72726&billStatusActionId=192256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72726&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72726&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72726&billStatusActionId=196329&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72726&billStatusActionId=196341&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback