AZ SB1089 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health professionals; unauthorized practice
Title
Behavioral health professionals; unauthorized practice
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 62 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Authorization
Behavioral Health Professionals
Civil Penalty
Class 6 Felony
Clinical Experience
Clinical Social Work
Department Of Health Services
Dhs
Direct Client Contact
Fees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Unauthorized Practice
Behavioral Health Professionals
Civil Penalty
Class 6 Felony
Clinical Experience
Clinical Social Work
Department Of Health Services
Dhs
Direct Client Contact
Fees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Unauthorized Practice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3286 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3293 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |