AZ SB1088 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Hearing: Feb 18 @ 1:00 pm in Caucus Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; pregnant women; dental care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; pregnant women; dental care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback