AZ SB1088 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Empowerment scholarship accounts; eligibility
Title
Empowerment scholarship accounts; eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |