AZ SB1084 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Injunction against harassment; fees
Title
Injunction against harassment; fees
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-01-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-25 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |