AZ SB1074 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tabulating equipment; standards; source codes
Title
Tabulating equipment; standards; source codes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-04-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2023-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-15 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Auditor General
Conduct Of Elections
Contest
Contestor
Election
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Elector
Electronic Tabulating Equipment
Filing
Source Codes
Standards
Statement Of Contest
Strike Everything Amendment
Superior Court
Tabulating Equipment
Technical Correction
Verification
Voting Equipment
Conduct Of Elections
Contest
Contestor
Election
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Elector
Electronic Tabulating Equipment
Filing
Source Codes
Standards
Statement Of Contest
Strike Everything Amendment
Superior Court
Tabulating Equipment
Technical Correction
Verification
Voting Equipment