AZ SB1066 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

School facilities board; reforms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities board; reforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-01-05SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15132Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69775
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1066p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1066s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.10660249.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1066ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1066floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69775&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69775&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69775&billStatusActionId=182290&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69775&billStatusActionId=182328&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69775&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments 750

feedback