AZ SB1066 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clerk of court; records; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clerk of court; records; reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateChapter 8
2017-03-14SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2017-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133990Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31412Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68618
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1066p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1066s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0008.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68618&billStatusActionId=174502&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68618&billStatusActionId=176414&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback