AZ SB1066 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Political subdivisions; financial audit reports

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political subdivisions; financial audit reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13 Chapter 268
2015-04-13 Governor Signed
2015-04-02 Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-02HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-04-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-2-0)
2015-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-02-18HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-02HouseHouse CMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2015-02-19HouseReferred to House CMA Committee
2015-02-19HouseHouse read second time
2015-02-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-02-18HouseAssigned to House CMA Committee
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-02-16SenateTransmit to House
2015-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2015-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-04SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2015-01-21SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2015-01-21SenateSenate read second time
2015-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-01-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2015-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback