AZ SB1060 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 1:00 pm in HHR 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Animal owners; definition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal owners; definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2023-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2023-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-07SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-01-26SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2023-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78640
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1060p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1060s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/501736
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505093
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506865
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78640&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78640&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78640&billStatusActionId=215866&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78640&billStatusActionId=215876&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78640&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback