AZ SB1052 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Senate HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Senate HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Medical procedures; prohibitions
Title
Medical procedures; prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Prefile |