AZ SB1047 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage insurance; repeal coverage limitation
Title
Mortgage insurance; repeal coverage limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-03-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | House Consent Calendar March 11, 2013 @ 3:00 PM |
2013-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | House FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House FI Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House FI Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar January 28, 2013 @ 1:03 PM |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |